Vanderburgh, George Albert (CPSO#: 24667)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2008