Vanderburgh, Leslie Carole (CPSO#: 60903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58149
Fax: (905) 494-6614
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Vanderburgh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Vanderburgh ( CPSO# 60903 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE CAROLE VANDERBURGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERBURGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990