Vanderburgh, Sarah Rosemary (CPSO#: 22845)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Isbister, Sarah Rosemary Jones (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017