Vanderkamp, Nicholas Henry (CPSO#: 63662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
380 Burnham Street
Suite 105
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone: (705) 741-3489
Fax: (705) 741-3715
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS HENRY VANDERKAMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERKAMP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1992