Vanderkooy, Jan (CPSO#: 24789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1977

Summary

Former Name: Vanderkooy, John (used until: 29 Nov 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN VANDERKOOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERKOOY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1977