Vanderkooy, John David (CPSO#: 77526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.O. 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 5197494300 Ext. 2144
Fax: 5197494377
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.D. Vanderkooy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vanderkooy ( CPSO# 77526 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
PO 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 573-7479

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID VANDERKOOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERKOOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007