Vandersluis, Joel (CPSO#: 61104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neurology Diagnostics
240 West Elmwood Drive
dayton OH  45459
United States
Phone: (937) 224-8200
Fax: (937) 224-1770
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Neurology Diagnostics
8605B North Dixie Drive
dayton OH  45414
United States
Phone: 9372248200
Fax: 9372241770
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL VANDERSLUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERSLUIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990