Vandersluis, Ronald (CPSO#: 60972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL2
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 335-5055
Fax: (416) 335-6183
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Vandersluis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vandersluis ( CPSO# 60972 )

Business Address:
LL2 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 335-5055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD VANDERSLUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERSLUIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Oct 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990