Vandersluis, Rudolf (CPSO#: 51990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4370
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite B
115 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4G7
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3355
Fax: (905) 721-4737
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rudy Vandersluis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vandersluis ( CPSO# 51990 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUDOLF VANDERSLUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERSLUIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1984