Vandewaetere, Anik Rose-Marie (CPSO#: 60752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C/O Towngate Family Medicine Clinic
2446 Bank Street
Suite 201
Ottawa ON  K1V 1A4
Phone: (613) 739-0998
Fax: (613) 739-1485
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIK ROSE-MARIE VANDEWAETERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEWAETERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 29 Feb 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1990