Vandewalle, Philip Leon (CPSO#: 62104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Caradoc Street North
Strathroy ON  N7G 2M5
Phone: (519) 245-3590
Fax: (519) 245-6032
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vandewalle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vandewalle ( CPSO# 62104 )

Business Address:
31 Caradoc Street North
Strathroy ON  N7G 2M5
Phone Number: (519) 245-3590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP LEON VANDEWALLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEWALLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991