Vandorpe, Robert Allan (CPSO#: 51982)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992