Vanek, Arthur William (CPSO#: 51981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6043
Fax: (416) 530-6796
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Universal Sleep Disorder Clinic
Suite 201
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 256-0600
Fax: (416) 256-0602
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arthur Vanek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vanek ( CPSO# 51981 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Suite 211
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 256-0600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Mississauga Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR WILLIAM VANEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1986