Vanek, Irene (CPSO#: 25210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, German

Education:J.E. Purkyne University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
3rd Floor
Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 5945
Fax: (416) 864-5953
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE VANEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1975