Vania, Mariam (CPSO#: 29570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Gujarati

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Grosvenor Court
Thornhill ON  L3T5T5
Phone: (416) 733-9032
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM VANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1977