Vanlerberghe, Kenneth Roger (CPSO#: 65401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kings Cross Doctors Office
17 Kings Cross Road
Bramalea ON  L6T 3V5
Phone: (905) 799-9144
Fax: (905) 799-2267
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Synergy Sports Medicine
235 Wallace Ave.
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 703-3525
Fax: (647) 343-8073
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ROGER VANLERBERGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANLERBERGHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993