Vanner, Stephen James (CPSO#: 52850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Division Of Gastroenterology
Department Of Medicine
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 2332
Fax: (613) 544-3114
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Flynn and Vanner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Flynn ( CPSO# 58587 )
Dr. S. Vanner ( CPSO# 52850 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JAMES VANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1985