Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Vant Voort, Marian Joan (CPSO#: 59739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Medical Centre
15017 Yonge Street
Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 727-9481
Fax: (905) 727-6280
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.J. Vant Voort Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vant Voort ( CPSO# 59739 )

Business Address:
Aurora Medical Centre
200 - 15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone Number: (905) 727-9481

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAN JOAN VANT VOORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANT VOORT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1989