Vanvliet, Deborah (CPSO#: 68191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101A
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 898-1814
Fax: (905) 898-7698
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH VANVLIET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANVLIET is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999