Varan, Lily R. (CPSO#: 42489)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Reghuvaran, Mary Lily (used until: 10 Aug 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should write to: PO Box 59056 RPO Alta Vista Ottawa, ON K1G 5T7
Date Received: 05 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012