Vardy, Rhonda Marie (CPSO#: 61035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Shaw Clinic
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 7467
Fax: (905) 883-2144
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Vardy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vardy ( CPSO# 61035 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
Shaw Clinic
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHONDA MARIE VARDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990