Varey, Peter Alan (CPSO#: 59843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
63 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-1865
Fax: (519) 756-7092
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
Centre
Chedoke McMaster
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
Corporation
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76363
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ALAN VAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAREY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992