Varga, Marica (CPSO#: 52805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek, Italian, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3149
Fax: (416) 530-6232
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARICA VARGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARGA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1985