Varghese, Sunil A (CPSO#: 86757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varghese Visram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Varghese ( CPSO# 86757 )
Dr. H. Visram ( CPSO# 88749 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
210 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 28 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL A VARGHESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARGHESE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011