Varhan, Kral (CPSO#: 63695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1824 Dorchester Court
Suite A
Goshen IN  46526
United States
Phone: (574) 534-2548
Fax: (574) 534-3622

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Indiana
USA - Nebraska

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRAL VARHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1992