Vari, Barbara Judith (CPSO#: 60673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Lawrence Health Centre
140 The Esplanade
1st Floor, Unit 3
Toronto ON  M5A 4P5
Phone: (416) 864-6000
Fax: (416) 360-4902
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Vari ( CPSO# 60673 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
St. Lawrence Health Centre
140 The Esplanade
Suite 3
Toronto ON  M5A 4P5
Phone Number: (416) 864-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA JUDITH VARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1990