Varieur, Stephen Paul (CPSO#: 70712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
348 Muskoka Rd 3 North
Huntsville Ontario
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-6137
Fax: (705) 789-6175
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gzik and Varieur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Varieur ( CPSO# 70712 )
Dr. D. Gzik ( CPSO# 70710 )

Business Address:
141 Roe Road
Huntsville ON  P1H 0A5
Phone Number: (705) 788-9352

Business Address:
Suite 201
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-6137

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL VARIEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARIEUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1996