Varkey, George Plamoottil (CPSO#: 41925)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Suite 303 240 Wharncliffe Road North London, Ontario N6H 4P2
Instructions: Patients should include their full mailing address, phone number, and the last date they attended the physicians office.
Date Received: 03 Nov 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Dec 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011