Varkul, Mark David (CPSO#: 69255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 746-1011
Fax: (416) 746-1411
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varkul and Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapiro ( CPSO# 70403 )
Dr. M. Varkul ( CPSO# 69255 )

Business Address:
100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 746-1011

Business Address:
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone Number: (416) 743-5853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID VARKUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARKUL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999