Varley, Talia Leanne Myers (CPSO#: 100318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
69 Queen St E #201
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone: 416 640 2389
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALIA LEANNE MYERS VARLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016