Varrin, Angela Evelyn (CPSO#: 93343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Medical Group
510 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone: (613) 433-5712
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
410 Raglan St N.
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Varrin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Varrin ( CPSO# 93343 )

Business Address:
Renfrew Medical Group
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 433-9152

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA EVELYN VARRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARRIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012