Varshney, Terry (CPSO#: 88567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hosp of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY VARSHNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARSHNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2014 to 06 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014