Varty, Christopher Bruce (CPSO#: 21375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1968

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto
Scarborough ON  M1E4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 17, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:

On December 2, 2008, Credit Valley Hospital notified the College that Dr. Christopher Bruce Varty's privileges were suspended, effective November 17, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER BRUCE VARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968