Vasarhelyi, Edward Moore (CPSO#: 82627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3413
Fax: (519) 663-3417
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. EM Vasarhelyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Vasarhelyi ( CPSO# 82627 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3413

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD MOORE VASARHELYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASARHELYI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010