Vasdev, Shawn (CPSO#: 86279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Queensway West Suite 226
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: 9052327001
Fax: 9052328002
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn Vasdev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vasdev ( CPSO# 86279 )

Business Address:
Suite 226
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 232-7001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN VASDEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASDEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012