Vasilescu, Ovidiu (CPSO#: 77230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 232
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 492-2960
Fax: (416) 492-4025
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OVIDIU VASILESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASILESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2003 to 06 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2004