Vasiliou, Denise Marie (CPSO#: 76376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: 416-469-6476
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE MARIE VASILIOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASILIOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006