Vasisth, Gaurav (CPSO#: 108513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 17 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAURAV VASISTH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VASISTH is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. VASISTH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VASISTH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. VASISTH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. VASISTH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. VASISTH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Jan 2016 to 14 Mar 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 15 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 04 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Feb 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 20 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018