Vasquez, Manuel O'Van (CPSO#: 22090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Feb 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:Main National University of San Marcos, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor
2045 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6E 3R4
Phone: (416) 651-2358
Fax: (416) 651-7472
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manuel Vasquez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vasquez ( CPSO# 22090 )

Business Address:
Suite 203, 3rd Floor
2045 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6E 3R4
Phone Number: (416) 651-2340

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 27, 2012, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Manuel O'Van Vasquez, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Vasquez has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Vasquez has voluntarily restricted his practice to chronic pain
                  management, methadone treatment for pain and methadone maintenance
                  treatment for opioid dependence.  Dr. Vasquez may not practice general
                  (family) medicine.