Vassiliou, Demetra (CPSO#: 58716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 729-6113
Fax: (613) 691-1276
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Demetra Vassiliou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vassiliou ( CPSO# 58716 )

Business Address:
301 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-6113

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEMETRA VASSILIOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASSILIOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1989