Vasudev, Pooja (CPSO#: 87216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Pathology
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Ext. 2290
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POOJA VASUDEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASUDEV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011