Vaughan, Derek John (CPSO#: 59950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Family Care Centre
50-1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1G4
Phone: (519) 637-2424
Fax: (519) 637-2537
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek Vaughan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vaughan ( CPSO# 59950 )

Business Address:
Unit 50
1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 4H4
Phone Number: (519) 637-2424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK JOHN VAUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Aug 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Sep 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1990 to 31 Oct 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989