Vaughan, Joanne (CPSO#: 62292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 Danforth Ave
Suite 407
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 465-7421
Fax: (416) 465-6588
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE VAUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991