Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Vaughan, Michele Lori (CPSO#: 60881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-4320
Fax: (905) 721-6192
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renato Alessandrini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alessandrini ( CPSO# 60894 )
Dr. M. Vaughan ( CPSO# 60881 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE LORI VAUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1991