Vaughan-Neil, Edward Francis (CPSO#: 29928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8106
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

My Health Centre
39 Pleasant Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4T 1K2
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-3467
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York Diagnostic and Cardiac
Centre
250 Marlee St, North York
North York ON  M6B 3H7
Canada
Phone: (416) 783-0000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 17 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD FRANCIS VAUGHAN-NEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN-NEIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1978