Vavougios, George (CPSO#: 70081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Fax: (905) 726-9631
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hellenic Home for the Aged
2411 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 4X1
Canada
Phone: (416) 654-7700
Fax: (416) 654-0943
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Vavougios Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Vavougios ( CPSO# 70081 )

Business Address:
Doctors on Bayview
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 726-9755

Business Address:
Hellenic Home for the Aged
2411 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 4X1
Phone Number: (416) 654-7718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE VAVOUGIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAVOUGIOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998