Vayalumkal, Philip Xavier (CPSO#: 84722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58097
Fax: (905) 494-6571
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Dr. E.
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905 494 2120 Ext. 58097
Fax: (905) 494-6571
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip X. Vayalumkal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vayalumkal ( CPSO# 84722 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP XAVIER VAYALUMKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAYALUMKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008