Vaz, Camila Maria (CPSO#: 66337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
798 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1N5
Phone: (416) 236-1654
Fax: (416) 236-1655
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Camila Vaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Vaz ( CPSO# 66337 )
Dr. J. Athayde ( CPSO# 65191 )

Business Address:
798 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 236-1654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMILA MARIA VAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1996