Vazquez de Anda, Gilberto Felipe (CPSO#: 87470)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 20 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008