Veale, John Laurence (CPSO#: 23780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:University of Dublin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
38 Church Street South
Ajax ON  L1S 6B3
Phone: (905) 427-1445
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pickering Urgent Care
1450 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Canada
Phone: 905-831-8333
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 31, 2004, Dr. John Laurence Veale agrees to the following as
            terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration:

                  -     Dr. Veale may not engage in or be involved with the administering
                        or dispensing of methadone.